Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ncep Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Seljuk, Selma, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management361 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary/Appeal) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.