Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Francodollar Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Griffin, Thomas, against Flores, Lilia Gomez, Flores, Lydia Gomez, Gomez, Luis Jesus, Gonzalez, Anibal, Latin Distribuidor, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Connolly, Rebecca presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time247 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Further Case Management Conference | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.