Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recoveryassociates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sherrill, Donald, against Pinney, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.