Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E, against Wilson, Ivan R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time360 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC Hearing | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Filed | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Removed from Court's Control |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.