Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gong, Li C, Gong, Yen Ming, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Krasney, Robert A, against Cruz, Lucila, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Application - No Fee | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.