Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grant &Amp; Weber, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Steinfeld, Reid L, against Ferguson, Scott, represented by Wells, J D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2013 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time777 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Further Case Management Conference | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.