Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rosellini, Taale L, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Purdin, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Burdick, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management119 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2013 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1814 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1814 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Burdick, Paul |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Document Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.