Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Litvin, Milton, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Hannon, John P, Ii, against Santa Cruz Metropolitan Transit District, represented by Syren, Leslyn K, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Time To Trial339 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time426 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Trial Calendar Call | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Removed from Court's Control | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.