Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chiesa, Carolyn, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Mcdonald, Richard, against Advanced Settlements, Inc., Fitzgerald, Michael L, Michael L Fitzgerald Insuranceservices Inc, represented by Ubl, Stephen C, Winget Spadafora &Amp;Schwartzberg Llp, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Time To Trial495 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time677 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Trial Calendar Call | |
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Removed from Court's Control | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.