Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Precision Recoveryanalytics Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ford, Andrew, against Houghtby, Nancy, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management362 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time406 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary/Appeal) | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary/Appeal) | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.