Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pacific Investors Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hoffman, Kirkman, against Estrada, Oscar, Mendoza, Martha, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial49 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Order | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Short Cause Trial
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Attachment Issued | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.