Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
One Stop Logisticsinc, filed a(n) (42) Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec): 10,000 To 25,000 case represented by Savage, Lindsey B W, against Vinocor Usa Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category(42) Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec): 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time145 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Further Case Management Conference | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Filed | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.