Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pride Acquisitionsllc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall, Matthew W, against Strachan, Jeffery W, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Paul P. Burdick presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time108 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Burdick, Paul |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Claim of Exemption
Judge: Burdick, Paul |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Claim of Exemption
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.