Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fia Card Services Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide, Flint, against Pinck, Matthew D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management370 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time131 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.