Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E, against Andrade, Kerry, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management361 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time361 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.