Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E, against Kreisher, Timothy D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Atack, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management361 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial517 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time517 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Short Cause Trial
Judge: Atack, Robert |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.