Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thirion, Frank, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Paris, Daniel, against Gustafasson, Rosalin, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial35 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time36 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Short Cause Trial | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Filed | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Denied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.