Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanchez, Antonio, Sanchez, Roberto, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Powell, Dennis, against Vargas, Vanessa Marie, Scolari, Allison, Scolari, Vincent A, represented by Burton, John, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time581 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Further Case Management Conference | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.