Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Snyder, David B, against Chalmers, David, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management364 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time133 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.