Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Delgadillo, Maria, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Roach, Valerie M, against Sally Beauty Supply Llc, represented by Phillips, Samuel L, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Time To Trial392 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time447 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Trial Calendar Call | |
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Trial Calendar Call | |
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.