Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Snyder, David B, against Doi, Gloria, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2011 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time115 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.