Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recoveryassociates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook, Jordan D, against Huffman, Jack D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Connolly, Rebecca presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2011 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1025 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Further Case Management Conference | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.