Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recoveryassociates,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook, Jordan D, against Macken, Anna C, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2011 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions144 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time144 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.