Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valdavia, Joel V, filed a(n) Workplace Harassment - Labor and Employment case against Dean, Seth, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment / Workplace Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeWorkplace Harassment |
Case Cycle Time82 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC Regarding Harassment
Judge: Almquist, Jeff |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC Regarding Harassment
Judge: Almquist, Jeff |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | ||
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition to prevent Civil Harrassment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.