Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ge Money Bank - Walmart, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Golden, Richard E, against Sarte, Beatrice, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time360 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.