Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert, against Warren, Patricia E, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management366 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time95 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary/Appeal) | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration for default filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.