Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Wiltshire, Kyer W, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.