Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Santa Cruz, filed a(n) Workplace Harassment - Labor and Employment case represented by Costa, Marie, against Hawkins, Tim, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment / Workplace Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeWorkplace Harassment |
Case Cycle Time40 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Almquist, Jeff |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Work Place Violence
Judge: Almquist, Jeff |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition - No Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.