Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lynch, Megan B, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Balsa, Jordan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallagher, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time386 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing and Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Almquist, Jeff |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
December 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.