Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Greystar, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rothbard, Todd, against Goldsmith, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2010 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time7 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | First Paper Filed - Fee | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | 5 Day Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | ||
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.