Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association Nd, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert, against Zomer, David H, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2010 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time185 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.