Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Moore, Harvey M, against Forsberg, Nancy L, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2010 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time108 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration for default filed | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.