Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Henriques, Janalie, against Reece, Gary, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management364 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2010 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Document Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.