Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Henriques, Janalie, against Guzman, Javier, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management361 days |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time655 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | ||
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.