Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Curran, Robert, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Gorley, David, against Zanotto, Deborah, Zanotto, Fred, represented by Pappy, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallagher, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Time To Trial349 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time349 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Short Cause Trial | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Mediation Hearing
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Mediation Hearing
Judge: Atack, Robert |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Mediation Hearing | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.