Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Henriques, Janalie, against Picanco, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Almquist, Jeff presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management364 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2009 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions408 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time408 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Further Case Management Conference | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.