Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Davis, Shedrick O, against Faraola, Frank L, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management362 days |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2009 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time344 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event | ||
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | ||
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration for default filed | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.