Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Infinity Insurancecompany, filed a(n) (42) Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec): 10,000 To 25,000 case represented by Green, Susan, against Korinek, Cynthia, Korinek, John Arthur, represented by Randolph, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category(42) Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec): 10,000 To 25,000 |
Time To Trial257 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time1378 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event | OSC Hearing and Further Case Management Conference | |
October 08, 2012 | Docket Event | OSC Hearing and Further Case Management Conference | |
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing
Judge: Almquist, Jeff |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | ||
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.