Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yellow Transportation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mendelson, Lee M, against Reversica Design Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management210 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time274 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event | ||
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ||
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event | OSC Hearing and Further Case Management Conference | |
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | ||
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ||
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.