Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Delizonna, Harry, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Santa Cruz Title Company, Stewart Title Of Califoria Inc, represented by Lopez, M Jeffery, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time176 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Further Case Management Conference | |
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | ||
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Almquist, Jeff |
|
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Cross Complaint | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.