Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association Nd, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert, against Pruett, Jeffrey J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Almquist, Jeff presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management210 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time339 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary/Appeal) | |
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.