Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young, Grayelin, filed a(n) Workplace Harassment - Labor and Employment case against Tudor, Naomi Quionez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment / Workplace Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeWorkplace Harassment |
Case Cycle Time115 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Reporters Transcript Filed | |
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC Regarding Harassment
Judge: Almquist, Jeff |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event | ||
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition to prevent Civil Harrassment | |
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.