Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Toyota Motor Credit Corp, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude, Raymond, against Nobles, Megan M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time274 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Atack, Robert |
|
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Henry, Stephen |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Atack, Robert |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | First Paper Filed - Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.