Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deasy, Thomas, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Greathouse, Shannon, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time19 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Request Filed | |
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event | ||
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | ||
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 5 Day Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.