Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allied Property &Amp; Casualty, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stone, Peter, against Arano-Sanchez, Marissa Zandra, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time160 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate of Facts Issued | |
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event | ||
May 18, 2007 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part | |
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Request Filed | |
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.