Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Resolution Investment Corp., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brewer, Lance A, against Basaldua, Juan M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallagher, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2004 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time320 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Yonts, Robert, Jr |
|
September 09, 2005 | Docket Event | ||
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Danner, Arthur, III |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event | ||
July 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.