Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sandra, Coto, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Minkner, William, against Rent-A-Car, Budget, Angleo, Sacco, represented by Mccarthy, Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 1998 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2000 | Docket Event | ||
October 20, 2000 | Docket Event | Other Hearing | |
September 11, 2000 | Docket Event | Other Hearing | |
September 08, 2000 | Docket Event | Other Hearing | |
September 06, 2000 | Docket Event | ||
August 25, 2000 | Docket Event | Other Hearing | |
August 25, 2000 | Docket Event | ||
August 18, 2000 | Docket Event | Other Hearing | |
August 16, 2000 | Docket Event | ||
August 09, 2000 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.