Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Santa Cruz County Of, filed a(n) (43) Limited Other Petition (Not Spec): Under 10,000 case represented by Child Support Services, against Roxanne, Pedone, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Connolly, Rebecca presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 1995 |
Category(43) Limited Other Petition (Not Spec): Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearings
Judge: Kast-Davids, Jana |
|
November 04, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
November 03, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Initial - OSC / Motion Filed | |
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.