Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Falstrom, Kenneth E, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Petition Other - Limited case against Hamdouh, Jawad, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2002 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition Other - Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2002 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
August 08, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment, Filed | |
July 30, 2002 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
July 30, 2002 | Docket Event | Application for and Renewal of Judgment, Filed | |
October 13, 1992 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
October 09, 1992 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
October 02, 1992 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
September 11, 1992 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
August 29, 1992 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
August 29, 1992 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.