Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Northstar Settlement Funding Inc, filed a(n) Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights: Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2023 |
CategoryTransfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition for the approval of the transfer of structured settlement payment rights. The petitioner, Northstar Settlement Funding, Inc., alleges that the payee of the structured settlement payments, Eann Carroll, resides in Stanisla...
Petition
Date: December 01, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: December 01, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 01, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: December 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CV-23-007038 – IN RE C, E – Petitioner’s Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights – HEARING REQUIRED. The Court will have clarifying questions on the economic status o... | |
December 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CV-23-007038 – IN RE C, E – Petitioner’s Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights – HEARING REQUIRED. The Court will have clarifying questions on the economic status o... | |
December 24, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CV-23-007038 – IN RE C, E – Petitioner’s Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights – HEARING REQUIRED. The Court will have clarifying questions on the economic status o... | |
December 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CV-23-007038 – IN RE C, E – Petitioner’s Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights – HEARING REQUIRED. The Court will have clarifying questions on the economic status o... | |
December 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CV-23-007038 – IN RE C, E – Petitioner’s Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights – HEARING REQUIRED. The Court will have clarifying questions on the economic status o... | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.